MI HB4001 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Assigned Pa 8'19 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Criminal procedure; forfeiture; asset forfeiture; require a criminal conviction before proceeding. Amends sec. 7521 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.7521) & adds sec. 7521a.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal procedure; forfeiture; asset forfeiture; require a criminal conviction before proceeding. Amends sec. 7521 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.7521) & adds sec. 7521a.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-25 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 73 (Y: 107 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 43 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 5 (Y: 107 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14HouseAssigned Pa 8'19 With Immediate Effect
2019-05-14HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 5/9/2019 @ 1:18 Pm
2019-05-14HouseApproved By The Governor 5/9/2019 @ 11:55 Am
2019-05-07HousePresented To The Governor 5/6/2019 @ 11:40 Am
2019-04-25HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2019-04-25HouseTitle Amendment Agreed To
2019-04-25House Roll Call # 73 Yeas 107 Nays 3
2019-04-25HouseSenate Substitute S-1 Concurred In
2019-04-25HouseRule Suspended
2019-04-25HouseLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2019-04-25HouseReturned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment
2019-04-25SenateInserted Full Title
2019-04-25SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 43 Yeas 37 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2019-04-24SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1
2019-04-24SenateSubstitute S-1 Concurred In
2019-04-24SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1
2019-04-23SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1
2019-04-23SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2019-04-23SenateReported Favorably With Substitute S-1
2019-03-05SenateReferred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety
2019-02-28HouseTransmitted
2019-02-28HouseTitle Amended
2019-02-28HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 5 Yeas 107 Nays 3
2019-02-28HouseRead A Third Time
2019-02-27HousePlaced On Third Reading
2019-02-27HouseSubstitute H-2 Adopted And Amended
2019-02-27HouseRead A Second Time
2019-02-26HouseReferred To Second Reading
2019-02-26HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2
2019-01-10HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 01/09/2019
2019-01-09HouseReferred To Committee On Judiciary
2019-01-09HouseRead A First Time
2019-01-09HouseIntroduced By Representative Jason Wentworth

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2019-HB-4001
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/House/htm/2019-HIB-4001.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/House/htm/2019-HEBH-4001.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/House/htm/2019-HEBS-4001.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billenrolled/House/htm/2019-HNB-4001.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/publicact/htm/2019-PA-0008.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-02-26-019.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-02-28-021.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2019-SJ-04-23-037.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2019-SJ-04-25-039.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-04-25-039.htm

Bill Comments

feedback