ME SP0502 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 8 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-09 - In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 8 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-09 - In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
JOINT RESOLUTION RECOGNIZING THE CITY OF SANFORD AS MAINE'S NEWEST CITY
Title
JOINT RESOLUTION RECOGNIZING THE CITY OF SANFORD AS MAINE'S NEWEST CITY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-09 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-05-09 | House | READ and ADOPTED. |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-05-08 | Senate | On motion by Senator TUTTLE of York, ADOPTED. |
2013-05-08 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by the President. |
2013-05-07 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2013-05-02 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2013-05-01 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2013-04-30 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2013-04-25 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2013-04-24 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2013-04-23 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2013-04-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator TUTTLE of York TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending the Motion by same Senator to ADOPT. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | READ. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.mainelegislature.org/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?paper=SP0502&snum=126 |
Text | https://www.mainelegislature.org/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0502&item=1&snum=126 |