ME LD997 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Promote Social and Emotional Learning and Development for Young Children
Title
An Act To Promote Social and Emotional Learning and Development for Young Children
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #178 (Y: 93 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-19 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-06-19 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-19 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-191) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-334) thereto. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2019-06-19 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-191) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-334) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-191) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-334) thereto ADOPTED |
2019-06-19 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-334) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-191) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Under further suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (S-191) was ADOPTED |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-191) |
2019-06-19 | Senate | On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2019-06-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator SANBORN, L. of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED in concurrence |
2019-06-06 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-06 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-06-05 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-05 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-191). |
2019-06-05 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2019-06-05 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-191) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-06-05 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2019-06-05 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 178 (Yeas 93 - Nays 50 - Absent 5 - Excused 2 Vacant 1) |
2019-06-05 | House | On motion of Representative KORNFIELD of Bangor, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-06-05 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-191) |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-191) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-06-04 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-06-04 | Senate | On motion by Senator MILLETT of Cumberland the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Reports Read |
2019-02-26 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-02-26 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |