ME LD994 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Resolve, To Require the Approval by the Public Utilities Commission of a Proposal for a Long-term Contract for Deep-water Offshore Wind Energy

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolve, To Require the Approval by the Public Utilities Commission of a Proposal for a Long-term Contract for Deep-water Offshore Wind Energy

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-12 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #234 (Y: 85 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14SenateFINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
2019-06-13HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-13HouseFINALLY PASSED.
2019-06-12HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-12HouseThe Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-245).
2019-06-12HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Resolve was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2019-06-12HouseSubsequently, Committee Amendment "A" (S-245) was ADOPTED.
2019-06-12HouseSpeaker laid before the House
2019-06-12HouseLater today assigned.
2019-06-12HouseOn motion of Representative MOONEN of Portland, TABLED pending ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (S-245).
2019-06-12HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (S-245) was READ.
2019-06-12HouseThe Resolve was READ ONCE.
2019-06-12HouseROLL CALL NO. 234 (Yeas 85 - Nays 60 - Absent 5 - Excused 1)
2019-06-12HouseOn motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2019-06-12HouseReports READ.
2019-06-11SenateSent down for concurrence
2019-06-11SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-245)
2019-06-11SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-245) READ and ADOPTED
2019-06-11SenateREAD ONCE
2019-06-11SenateOn motion by Senator LAWRENCE of York the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended By Committee Amendment "A" (S-245) Report ACCEPTED.
2019-06-11SenateReports Read
2019-05-08HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-05-08HouseSubsequently, the Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY.
2019-05-08HouseSpeaker laid before the House
2019-05-07HouseUnfinished Business
2019-05-02HouseUnfinished Business
2019-04-30HouseUnfinished Business
2019-04-25HouseUnfinished Business
2019-04-23HouseUnfinished Business
2019-04-18HouseUnfinished Business
2019-04-16HouseUnfinished Business
2019-04-11HouseUnfinished Business
2019-04-04HouseUnfinished Business
2019-04-02HouseUnfinished Business
2019-03-28HouseUnfinished Business
2019-03-26HouseUnfinished Business
2019-03-21HouseUnfinished Business
2019-03-19HouseUnfinished Business
2019-03-14HouseUnfinished Business
2019-03-14HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-03-14HouseOn motion of Representative FECTEAU of Biddeford, the Resolve was TABLED pending REFERENCE in concurrence.
2019-03-12SenateSent down for concurrence
2019-03-12SenateSubsequently On motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY
2019-03-12SenateTaken from the table by the President
2019-03-07SenateUnfinished Business
2019-03-05SenateUnfinished Business
2019-02-28SenateUnfinished Business
2019-02-26SenateUnfinished Business
2019-02-26SenateOn motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE
2019-02-26SenateCommittee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY suggested and ordered printed

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback