ME LD993 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Retroactively Grant Sick Leave Days to Public School Employees Affected by COVID-19
Title
An Act To Retroactively Grant Sick Leave Days to Public School Employees Affected by COVID-19
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - Senate - Enact-emer 2/3 Elect RC #269 (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-15 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-15 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-15 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-06-14 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-14 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-333) and Senate Amendment "A" (S-262). |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2021-06-14 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-333) and Senate Amendment "A" (S-262) In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2021-06-14 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-262) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-06-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator DAUGHTRY of Cumberland Under suspension of the Rules The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-09 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required in concurrence |
2021-06-09 | Senate | On motion by Senator DAUGHTRY of Cumberland The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Bill FAILED ENACTMENT |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 269 Yeas 20 - Nays 14 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 |
2021-06-09 | Senate | FAILED EMERGENCY ENACTMENT |
2021-06-09 | Senate | - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2021-06-08 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-08 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-06-08 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-333) in concurrence |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-333) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-06-07 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-06-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator HICKMAN of Kennebec the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Reports Read |
2021-06-03 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-03 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-333). |
2021-06-03 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-06-03 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-333) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-03 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2021-06-03 | House | On motion of Representative SYLVESTER of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-03 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-02 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2021-05-10 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-05-10 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-04-28 | Senate | REFERENCED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING in concurrence |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2021-04-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-04-28 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING |
2021-04-28 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2021-04-28 | House | Representative BRENNAN from the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS Reporting that the Bill be REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING. |
2021-04-12 | Joint | Reported Out: REFERRED TO LBHS |
2021-04-12 | Joint | Referred To: LBHS |
2021-04-02 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-04-02 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS in concurrence |
2021-03-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-10 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. |
2021-03-10 | House | Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |