ME LD992 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Extend the Down East Sunrise Trail from Ayers Junction to Calais
Title
Resolve, To Extend the Down East Sunrise Trail from Ayers Junction to Calais
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2020-03-17 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-06-20 | House | Carried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-03-28 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-03-28 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION |
2019-03-28 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | On motion by Senator DILL of Penobscot for the Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry REFERRED to the Committee on Transportation. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2019-02-26 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-02-26 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=992&snum=129 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0282&item=1&snum=129 |