ME LD992 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Authorize Moving the Town Line between Baileyville and Baring Plantation
Title
An Act To Authorize Moving the Town Line between Baileyville and Baring Plantation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-16 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #97 (Y: 141 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Reconsideration - Veto RC #123 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Reconsideration - Veto RC #123 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-16 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-16 | House | Sent to the Engrossing Department. |
2017-05-16 | House | In concurrence. |
2017-05-16 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 97V 141 having voted in the affirmative and 4 in the negative, with 4 being absent, and 2 excused, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted. |
2017-05-16 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2017-05-11 | Senate | LD 992 In Senate, May 11, 2017, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 31 IN FAVOR and 0 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2017-04-25 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-25 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-04-19 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-19 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-26). |
2017-04-19 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2017-04-19 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-26) |
2017-04-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-26) READ and ADOPTED |
2017-04-13 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED |
2017-03-14 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-03-14 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-03-14 | Senate | REFERENCE to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT suggested and ordered printed |