ME LD991 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on June 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-09 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on June 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-09 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Directing the Department of Transportation To Conduct an Economic Evaluation Study for Commuter and Passenger Train Service between Portland and the Lewiston and Auburn Area
Title
Resolve, Directing the Department of Transportation To Conduct an Economic Evaluation Study for Commuter and Passenger Train Service between Portland and the Lewiston and Auburn Area
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-09 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-08 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-08 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2021-06-08 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-08 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-180). |
2021-06-08 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Resolve was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-06-08 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-180) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-08 | House | The Resolve was READ ONCE. |
2021-06-08 | House | On motion of Representative MARTIN of Sinclair, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-08 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-180) |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-180) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-06-07 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-06-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator DIAMOND of Cumberland The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-06-03 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2021-05-25 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-05-25 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-05-21 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-10 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-10 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Committee on TRANSPORTATION suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |