ME LD991 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-29 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Amend Maine's Genetically Modified Food Products Labeling Law

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Maine's Genetically Modified Food Products Labeling Law

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-28 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #549 (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - House - Acc Min Otp As Amended RC #513 (Y: 85 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-29SenateIn possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
2016-03-30SenateOn motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT in concurrence
2016-03-29HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2016-03-29HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2016-03-28HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2016-03-28HouseThe House RECEDED and CONCURRED to ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-596).
2016-03-28SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
2016-03-28SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-596) In NON-CONCURRENCE
2016-03-28SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-596) READ and ADOPTED
2016-03-28SenateREAD ONCE
2016-03-28SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 549 Yeas 22 - Nays 12 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 PREVAILED
2016-03-28SenateOn motion by Senator EDGECOMB of Aroostook Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE
2016-03-28SenateReports READ
2016-03-24HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2016-03-24HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "B" (H-597).
2016-03-24HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2016-03-24HouseCommittee Amendment "B" (H-597) was READ and ADOPTED.
2016-03-24HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2016-03-24HouseROLL CALL NO. 513 (Yeas 85 - Nays 59 - Absent 7 - Excused 0)
2016-03-24HouseOn motion of Representative DUNPHY of Old Town, the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2016-03-24HouseReports READ.
2015-07-21SenateCARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. in concurrence
2015-06-30HouseCarried over to any special and/or regular session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992.
2015-04-14SenateOn motion by Senator Edgecomb of Aroostook REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY , in concurrence.
2015-04-14SenateTaken from the table by the President
2015-04-09SenateUnfinished Business
2015-04-07SenateUnfinished Business
2015-04-02SenateUnfinished Business
2015-04-01SenateUnfinished Business
2015-03-31SenateUnfinished Business
2015-03-26SenateUnfinished Business
2015-03-25SenateUnfinished Business
2015-03-24SenateUnfinished Business
2015-03-19SenateOn motion by Senator EDGECOMB of Aroostook Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE
2015-03-18HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2015-03-18HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY.
2015-03-18HouseCommittee on Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback