ME LD990 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Failed on September 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Prevent Violence against Law Enforcement Officers, Emergency Medical Care Providers and Firefighters

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Prevent Violence against Law Enforcement Officers, Emergency Medical Care Providers and Firefighters

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-27 - House - Enactment RC #409 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-06-23 - House - Passage To Be Engrossed RC #394 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-06-23 - House - Adopt Hdh-551 To Cas-265 RC #393 (Y: 63 N: 79 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Accept Rpt 'a' Otp-a RC #363 (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-13SenateIn possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
2018-05-02SenateCARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748.
2017-08-02SenateCARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 601.
2017-06-28SenateOn motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT in concurrence
2017-06-27HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-06-27HouseROLL CALL NO. 409 (Yeas 143 - Nays 0 - Absent 7 - Excused 1)
2017-06-27HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2017-06-27SenateOn motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED To ACCEPTANCE of Report A Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-265) AND PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-265) as Amended by House Amendment "B" (H-542) thereto in concurrence
2017-06-23HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-06-23HouseIn NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence.
2017-06-23HouseROLL CALL NO. 394 (Yeas 140 - Nays 0 - Absent 11 - Excused 0)
2017-06-23HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-265) as Amended by House Amendment "B" (H-542) thereto.
2017-06-23HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2017-06-23HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (S-265) as Amended by House Amendment "B" (H-542) thereto was ADOPTED.
2017-06-23HouseOn motion of Representative NADEAU of Winslow, House Amendment "B" (H-542) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-265) was READ and ADOPTED.
2017-06-23HouseROLL CALL NO. 393 (Yeas 63 - Nays 79 - Absent 9 - Excused 0)
2017-06-23HouseSubsequently, House Amendment "D" (H-551) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-265) FAILED ADOPTION.
2017-06-23HouseOn motion of Representative WARREN of Hallowell, House Amendment "D" (H-551) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-265) was READ.
2017-06-23HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (S-265) was READ.
2017-06-23HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2017-06-23HouseOn motion of Representative WARREN of Hallowell, REPORT A Ought to Pass as Amended was ACCEPTED.
2017-06-23HouseSpeaker laid before the House
2017-06-23HouseLater today assigned.
2017-06-23HouseOn motion of Representative HERBIG of Belfast, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Any Report.
2017-06-23HouseReports READ.
2017-06-21SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence
2017-06-21SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-265)
2017-06-21SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-265) READ and ADOPTED
2017-06-21SenateREAD ONCE
2017-06-21SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 363 Yeas 30 - Nays 4 - Excused 1 - Absent 0
2017-06-21SenateSubsequently Report A Ought to Pass As Amended ACCEPTED
2017-06-21SenateTaken from the table by the President
2017-06-21SenateOn motion by Senator VOLK of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE of Report A Ought to Pass As Amended
2017-06-21SenateTaken from the table by the President
2017-06-20SenateUnfinished Business
2017-06-19SenateUnfinished Business
2017-06-16SenateUnfinished Business
2017-06-15SenateUnfinished Business
2017-06-14SenateUnfinished Business
2017-06-14SenateOn motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock to ACCEPT Report A Ought to Pass as Amended . as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-265) Roll Call Ordered
2017-06-14SenateSenator ROSEN of Hancock moved to ACCEPT Report A Ought to Pass as Amended .
2017-06-14SenateReports READ
2017-03-14HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-03-14HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY.
2017-03-14SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence
2017-03-14SenateREFERENCE to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY
2017-03-14SenateCommittee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY suggested and ordered printed

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback