ME LD99 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 313 Yeas 18 - Nays 15 - Excused 2 - Absent 0
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 313 Yeas 18 - Nays 15 - Excused 2 - Absent 0
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Require the State To Divest Itself of Assets Invested in the Fossil Fuel Industry
Title
An Act To Require the State To Divest Itself of Assets Invested in the Fossil Fuel Industry
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - Senate - Enactment RC #313 (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Accept Rpt 'a' Otp-a RC #257 (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - Acc Report 'a' Otp As Amend RC #137 (Y: 80 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Accept Rpt 'a' Otp-a RC #257 (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - Acc Report 'a' Otp As Amend RC #137 (Y: 80 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 313 Yeas 18 - Nays 15 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 |
2021-06-10 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-09 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-337) in concurrence |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-337) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-06-08 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 257 Yeas 19 - Nays 13 - Excused 3 - Absent 0 |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Subsequently Report A Ought to Pass As Amended ACCEPTED |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-07 | Senate | On further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending his motion to ACCEPT the Report A Ought to Pass as Amended Report, |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Senator HICKMAN of Kennebec moved to ACCEPT the Report A Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-06-03 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-03 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-337). |
2021-06-03 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-06-03 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-337) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-03 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2021-06-03 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 137 (Yeas 80 - Nays 57 - Absent 14 - Excused 0) |
2021-06-03 | House | On motion of Representative SYLVESTER of Portland, REPORT A Ought to Pass as Amended was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-03 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-02 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP/OTP-AM |
2021-05-12 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-05-12 | Joint | Work Session Reconsidered |
2021-04-14 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-04-14 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-01-11 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-01-11 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on January 11, 2021. |