ME LD987 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Failed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Provide Autonomy for Health Care Providers To Practice Patient-centered Care by Amending the Laws Governing Medical Exemptions to Immunization Requirements

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Provide Autonomy for Health Care Providers To Practice Patient-centered Care by Amending the Laws Governing Medical Exemptions to Immunization Requirements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-04 - Senate - Accept Maj Ontp Rpt RC #187 (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-05HousePlaced in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
2019-06-05HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-05HouseOn motion of Representative KORNFIELD of Bangor, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
2019-06-05HouseReports READ.
2019-06-04SenateSent down for concurrence
2019-06-04SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 187 Yeas 19 - Nays 16 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
2019-06-04SenateSubsequently The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED
2019-06-04SenateTaken from the table by the President
2019-06-03SenateUnfinished Business
2019-06-03SenateOn further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report,
2019-06-03SenateSenator LIBBY of Androscoggin moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report.
2019-06-03SenateReports READ
2019-02-26HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-02-26HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS.
2019-02-26SenateCommittee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback