ME LD984 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on June 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-21 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to Expand Access to the Homestead Property Tax Exemption

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act to Expand Access to the Homestead Property Tax Exemption

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-20 - Senate - Accept Majority Ought Not To Pass Report RC #391 (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-21HousePlaced in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
2023-06-21HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2023-06-21HouseOn motion of Representative PERRY of Bangor, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
2023-06-21HouseReports READ.
2023-06-20SenateSent down for concurrence
2023-06-20SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 391 Yeas 24 - Nays 9 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 PREVAILED
2023-06-20SenateOn motion by Senator GROHOSKI of Hancock The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED
2023-06-20SenateReports READ
2023-06-20JointReported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM
2023-06-01JointVoted: Divided Report
2023-06-01JointWork Session Held
2023-03-30SenateCARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594.
2023-03-02HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2023-03-02HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION.
2023-03-02SenateCommittee on TAXATION suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on TAXATION Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback