ME LD984 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-06 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-06 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Separate the Authorities under the Licenses for Property and Casualty Insurance Adjusters and Workers' Compensation Insurance Adjusters
Title
An Act To Separate the Authorities under the Licenses for Property and Casualty Insurance Adjusters and Workers' Compensation Insurance Adjusters
Sponsors
Sen. Rodney Whittemore [R] | Rep. John Picchiotti [R] | Sen. Roger Katz [R] | Sen. Brian Langley [R] |
Sen. Kimberley Rosen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-06 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2017-06-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-05 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-05-31 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-31 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-149). |
2017-05-31 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2017-05-31 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-149). |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-149) READ and ADOPTED. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2017-04-18 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-18 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to REFERENCE to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-04-13 | Senate | On motion by Senator LANGLEY of Hancock The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-04-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator WHITTEMORE of Somerset Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE |
2017-04-11 | Senate | RECALLED From Legislative Files pursuant to Joint Order SP 452. |
2017-03-30 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2017-03-30 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-03-30 | House | The House INSISTED on REFERENCE to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-03-28 | Senate | On motion by Senator WHITTEMORE of Somerset The Senate ADHERED To REFERENCE to the Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-03-21 | Senate | On motion by Senator WHITTEMORE of Somerset Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION |
2017-03-16 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-03-16 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2017-03-16 | House | Subsequently, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT. |
2017-03-16 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2017-03-14 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-03-14 | House | Later today assigned. |
2017-03-14 | House | On motion of Representative HERBIG of Belfast, TABLED pending REFERENCE in concurrence. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-03-14 | Senate | REFERENCE to the Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES suggested and ordered printed |
2017-03-14 | House | Unfinished Business |