ME LD983 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-16 - Ordered Sent Forthwith.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-16 - Ordered Sent Forthwith.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Increase Efficiency in the Enforcement of Restitution and Bail Orders
Title
An Act To Increase Efficiency in the Enforcement of Restitution and Bail Orders
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-16 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #334 (Y: 99 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Veto Override (2/3) RC #310 (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Veto Override (2/3) RC #310 (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-16 | House | Ordered Sent Forthwith. |
2017-06-16 | House | Sent to the Engrossing Department. |
2017-06-16 | House | In concurrence. |
2017-06-16 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 334V 99 having voted in the affirmative and 42 in the negative, with 10 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted. |
2017-06-16 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Subsequently LD 983 In Senate, June 15, 2017, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 34 IN FAVOR and 1 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN. |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President ProTem |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator COLLINS of York Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending CONSIDERATION |
2017-05-31 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2017-05-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-30 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-05-24 | House | In concurrence. |
2017-05-24 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-115). |
2017-05-24 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2017-05-24 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-115). |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-115) READ and ADOPTED. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2017-03-14 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-03-14 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |