ME LD982 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - Subsequently FINALLY PASSED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - Subsequently FINALLY PASSED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Expand the Use of the Women, Infants and Children Special Supplemental Food Program at Farmers' Markets
Title
Resolve, To Expand the Use of the Women, Infants and Children Special Supplemental Food Program at Farmers' Markets
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-19 | Senate | Subsequently FINALLY PASSED in concurrence |
2019-06-19 | Senate | On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | On motion by Senator SANBORN, L. of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE, in concurrence. |
2019-06-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-05 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-427), in concurrence. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-427) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-04 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-04 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-427). |
2019-06-04 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-06-04 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-02-26 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence |
2019-02-26 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-02-26 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2019-02-26 | House | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |