ME LD981 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Failed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Failed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding State Investments and the Dakota Access Pipeline
Title
An Act Regarding State Investments and the Dakota Access Pipeline
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-11 - House - Acc Min Otp As Amended Rep RC #84 (Y: 60 N: 88 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Accept Maj Ontp Rpt RC #117 (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Accept Maj Ontp Rpt RC #117 (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2017-05-11 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-11 | House | On motion of Representative GATTINE of Westbrook, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-05-11 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 84 (Yeas 60 - Nays 88 - Absent 2 - Excused 1) |
2017-05-11 | House | Motion of Representative GATTINE of Westbrook to ACCEPT the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report FAILED. |
2017-05-11 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 117 Yeas 21 - Nays 12 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Subsequently The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-04 | Senate | On further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report, |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Senator HAMPER of Oxford moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Reports READ |
2017-03-23 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-03-23 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-03-21 | Senate | On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-03-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator DAVIS of Piscataquis Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT suggested and ordered printed |