ME LD976 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Require Additional Lead Screening for Children
Title
An Act To Require Additional Lead Screening for Children
Sponsors
Rep. Victoria Morales [D] | Rep. Diane Denk [D] | Rep. Jessica Fay [D] | Rep. Andrew Gattine [D] |
Rep. Michele Meyer [D] | Sen. Teresa Pierce [D] | Rep. Lois Galgay Reckitt [D] | Rep. Tiffany Roberts-Lovell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-28 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-296), in concurrence. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-296) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-21 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-21 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-296). |
2019-05-21 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-05-21 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-03-05 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence |
2019-02-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-02-28 | House | Subsequently, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2019-02-28 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2019-02-26 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-02-26 | House | Later today assigned. |
2019-02-26 | House | On motion of Representative HYMANSON of York, TABLED pending REFERENCE. |
2019-02-26 | House | Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed. |