ME LD972 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-07 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-07 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Directing the Department of Environmental Protection to Evaluate Strategies for Improving the Returnable Beverage Container Laws
Title
Resolve, Directing the Department of Environmental Protection to Evaluate Strategies for Improving the Returnable Beverage Container Laws
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-07 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2023-06-06 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP |
2023-06-01 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2023-06-01 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-06-01 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2023-05-24 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2023-05-18 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2023-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-03-02 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES in concurrence |
2023-03-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-03-02 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES. |
2023-03-02 | House | Committee on Environment and Natural Resources suggested and ordered printed. |