ME LD970 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Failed on August 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-02 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Failed on August 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-02 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To End Homelessness by Expanding Housing Support Services
Title
An Act To End Homelessness by Expanding Housing Support Services
Sponsors
Rep. Erik Jorgensen [D] | Sen. Mark Dion [D] | Sen. Shenna Bellows [D] | Rep. Ryan Fecteau [D] |
Rep. Rachel Talbot Ross [D] | Rep. Denise Tepler [D] | Rep. Karen Vachon [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-08-02 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #447 (Y: 83 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2017-05-24 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #157 (Y: 87 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #157 (Y: 87 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-02 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2017-08-02 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-08-02 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 447V 83 having voted in the affirmative and 54 in the negative, with 13 being absent, and 1 excused, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill not become a law and the veto was sustained. |
2017-08-02 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2017-07-20 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2017-07-20 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-07-20 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-07-20 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-07-20 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-209) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-330) thereto. |
2017-07-20 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-07-20 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-209) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-330) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-07-20 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-209) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-330) thereto ADOPTED |
2017-07-20 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-330) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-209) READ and ADOPTED |
2017-07-20 | Senate | Under further suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator RECONSIDERED whereby The Senate ADOPTED Committee Amendment "A" (H-209) |
2017-07-20 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Under suspension of the Rules The Senate RECONSIDERED PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED |
2017-07-20 | Senate | On Motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | On motion by Senator KATZ of Kennebec PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT |
2017-05-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-30 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-209) in concurrence |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-209) READ and ADOPTED |
2017-05-25 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-05-25 | Senate | On motion by Senator VOLK of Cumberland the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Reports Read |
2017-05-24 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-24 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-209). |
2017-05-24 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2017-05-24 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-209) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2017-05-24 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2017-05-24 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 157 (Yeas 87 - Nays 58 - Absent 4 - Excused 2) |
2017-05-24 | House | On motion of Representative FECTEAU of Biddeford, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-05-24 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT in concurrence |
2017-03-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-03-09 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT. |
2017-03-09 | House | Committee on Labor, Commerce, Research and Economic Development suggested and ordered printed. |