ME LD97 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-30 - (S) Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

RESOLUTION, Proposing an Amendment to the Constitution of Maine To Prohibit Certain Changes to a Direct Initiative of Legislation for a Period of Time after It Is Approved by the Voters

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

RESOLUTION, Proposing an Amendment to the Constitution of Maine To Prohibit Certain Changes to a Direct Initiative of Legislation for a Period of Time after It Is Approved by the Voters

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-30 (S) Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
2011-03-30 (S) Reports READ On motion by Senator FARNHAM of Penobscot Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
2011-03-29 (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2011-03-29 (H) ROLL CALL NO. 13 (Yeas 140 - Nays 5 - Absent 6 - Excused 0)
2011-03-29 (H) Subsequently, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
2011-03-29 (H) Subsequently, Representative RUSSELL of Portland WITHDREW her motion to TABLE.
2011-03-29 (H) Representative RUSSELL of Portland MOVED to TABLE pending the motion of Representative BEAULIEU of Auburn to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report.
2011-03-29 (H) Representative BEAULIEU of Auburn moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report.
2011-03-29 (H) Reports READ.
2011-01-20 (S) On motion by Senator Farnham of Penobscot, REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS and ordered printed, in concurrence.
2011-01-18 (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2011-01-18 (H) The RESOLUTION was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS.
2011-01-18 (H) Committee on Veterans and Legal Affairs suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback