ME LD966 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on September 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on September 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding Persons with Mental Illness and Substance Use Disorders in Jails and Correctional Facilities
Title
An Act Regarding Persons with Mental Illness and Substance Use Disorders in Jails and Correctional Facilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-13 | Senate | In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD). |
2018-05-02 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2018-04-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-04-09 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2018-04-09 | House | In accordance with the provisions of Section 21 of Article IX of the Constitution, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2018-04-05 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-04-05 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-700) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-441) thereto. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2018-04-04 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-700) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-441) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-700) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-441) thereto ADOPTED |
2018-04-04 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-441) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-700) READ and ADOPTED |
2018-04-04 | Senate | On motion by Senator DESCHAMBAULT of York RECONSIDERED whereby The Senate ADOPTED Committee Amendment "A" (H-700) |
2018-04-04 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME |
2018-04-04 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-700) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence |
2018-04-03 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2018-04-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-04-02 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-700). |
2018-04-02 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2018-04-02 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2017-08-02 | House | Carried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138. |
2017-08-02 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence |
2017-03-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-03-09 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2017-03-09 | House | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |