ME LD965 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-09-29 - Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Concerning Nondisclosure Agreements in Employment

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Nondisclosure Agreements in Employment

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-29HouseCarried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302.
2021-09-29HouseUnfinished Business
2021-07-19HouseCarried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302.
2021-07-19HouseUnfinished Business
2021-07-02HouseUnfinished Business
2021-06-30HouseUnfinished Business
2021-06-17HouseUnfinished Business
2021-06-15HouseUnfinished Business
2021-06-14HouseUnfinished Business
2021-06-10HouseUnfinished Business
2021-06-09HouseUnfinished Business
2021-06-08HouseUnfinished Business
2021-06-07HouseUnfinished Business
2021-06-03HouseUnfinished Business
2021-06-02HouseUnfinished Business
2021-06-02HouseLater today assigned.
2021-06-02HouseOn further motion of same Representative TABLED pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report.
2021-06-02HouseRepresentative SYLVESTER of Portland moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report.
2021-06-02HouseReports READ.
2021-05-18JointReported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP
2021-05-03JointVoted: Divided Report
2021-05-03JointWork Session Held
2021-03-30HouseCarried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
2021-03-10SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING in concurrence
2021-03-10HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2021-03-10HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING.
2021-03-10HouseCommittee on Labor and Housing suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback