ME LD963 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-17 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-17 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Ensure Culturally Informed Programs and Services for Adjudicated Juveniles in the Custody of the Department of Corrections
Title
An Act To Ensure Culturally Informed Programs and Services for Adjudicated Juveniles in the Custody of the Department of Corrections
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-17 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #418 (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-17 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-17 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-619) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-656) thereto in concurrence |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-619) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-656) thereto ADOPTED |
2021-06-17 | Senate | House Amendment "A" (H-656) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-619) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-619) READ |
2021-06-17 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 418 Yeas 22 - Nays 12 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 |
2021-06-17 | Senate | On motion by Senator DESCHAMBAULT of York The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-06-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-16 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-619) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-656) thereto. |
2021-06-16 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-06-16 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-619) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-656) thereto was ADOPTED. |
2021-06-16 | House | On motion of Representative BROOKS of Lewiston, House Amendment "A" (H-656) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-619) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-16 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-619) was READ |
2021-06-16 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2021-06-16 | House | Subsequently, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-16 | House | Subsequently, Representative PICKETT of Dixfield WITHDREW his REQUEST for a Roll Call. |
2021-06-16 | House | Representative PICKETT of Dixfield REQUESTED a Roll Call. More than one-fifth of the members present expressed a desire for a roll call, which was ORDERED. |
2021-06-16 | House | Representative WARREN of Hallowell moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2021-06-16 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2021-06-15 | House | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-15 | House | Later today assigned. |
2021-06-15 | House | On motion of Representative WARREN of Hallowell, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report. |
2021-06-15 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-14 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2021-05-25 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-05-25 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-05-18 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-04-14 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY in concurrence |
2021-03-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-10 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2021-03-10 | House | Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety suggested and ordered printed. |