ME LD963 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Exempt Overtime Pay from Individual Income Tax
Title
An Act To Exempt Overtime Pay from Individual Income Tax
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Senate - Insist RC #310 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Adopt Sas-256 To Cah-259 RC #283 (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Accept Min Otp-a Rpt RC #282 (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #191 (Y: 90 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Adopt Sas-256 To Cah-259 RC #283 (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Accept Min Otp-a Rpt RC #282 (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #191 (Y: 90 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-17 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 310 Yeas 32 - Nays 0 - Excused 3 - Absent 0 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | On motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin The Senate INSISTED To Acceptance of The Minority Ought to Pass As Amended Report and the Bill PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-259) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-256) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2019-06-13 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-13 | House | The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-259) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-256) In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-259) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-256) thereto ADOPTED |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 283 Yeas 20 - Nays 15 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin Senate Amendment "A" (S-256) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-259) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-259) READ |
2019-06-12 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 282 Yeas 30 - Nays 5 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator CHIPMAN of Cumberland The Minority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-06-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator CHIPMAN of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Reports READ |
2019-06-06 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-06 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 191 (Yeas 90 - Nays 51 - Absent 7 - Excused 2 Vacant 1) |
2019-06-06 | House | Subsequently, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-06-06 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2019-06-05 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-06-04 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-06-03 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-05-30 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-05-29 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-05-28 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-05-23 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-05-21 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-05-16 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-05-16 | House | Later today assigned. |
2019-05-16 | House | On further motion of same Representative TABLED pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2019-05-16 | House | Representative TIPPING of Orono moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2019-05-16 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION in concurrence |
2019-02-21 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-02-21 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION. |
2019-02-21 | House | Committee on Taxation suggested and ordered printed. |