ME LD960 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Allow Municipalities with Municipal Shellfish Conservation Ordinances To Establish Minimum and Maximum Size Limits for Shellfish That Are at Least as Strict as Those Limits Established by the State
Title
An Act To Allow Municipalities with Municipal Shellfish Conservation Ordinances To Establish Minimum and Maximum Size Limits for Shellfish That Are at Least as Strict as Those Limits Established by the State
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-09 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-177), in concurrence. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-177) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-02 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-177). |
2019-05-02 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-05-02 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-02-21 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on MARINE RESOURCES in concurrence |
2019-02-21 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-02-21 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on MARINE RESOURCES. |
2019-02-21 | House | Committee on Marine Resources suggested and ordered printed. |