ME LD960 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-27 - (S) FINALLY PASSED in concurrence
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-27 - (S) FINALLY PASSED in concurrence
Summary
Resolve, Requiring Rulemaking by the Maine Health Data Organization in Consultation with the Maine Quality Forum Regarding Clostridium Difficile and Methicillin-resistant Staphylococcus Aureus
Title
Resolve, Requiring Rulemaking by the Maine Health Data Organization in Consultation with the Maine Quality Forum Regarding Clostridium Difficile and Methicillin-resistant Staphylococcus Aureus
Sponsors
Rep. Seth Berry [D] | Sen. Joseph Brannigan [D] | Rep. Mark Eves [D] | Rep. Patricia Jones [D] |
Sen. Lisa Marrache [D] | Sen. Peter Mills [R] | Sen. Linda Sanborn [D] | Rep. Meredith Strang Burgess [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-27 | (S) FINALLY PASSED in concurrence | |
2009-05-26 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-05-26 | (H) ROLL CALL NO. 109 (Yeas 143 - Nays 1 - Absent 7 - Excused 0) | |
2009-05-26 | (H) FINALLY PASSED. | |
2009-05-20 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-280) in concurrence | |
2009-05-20 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Damon, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2009-05-19 | (S) Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day | |
2009-05-19 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (H-280) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence | |
2009-05-19 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2009-05-19 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence | |
2009-05-18 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-05-18 | (H) The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-280) | |
2009-05-18 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2009-05-18 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative HAYES, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2009-05-14 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2009-03-10 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Senator Brannigan of Cumberland, REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES and ordered printed, in concurrence. | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-03-10 | (H) The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |