ME LD95 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - FINALLY PASSED - Emergency 2/3 Present Required in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

RESOLUTION, Proposing an Amendment to the Constitution of Maine To Establish a Right to Food

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

RESOLUTION, Proposing an Amendment to the Constitution of Maine To Establish a Right to Food

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-10 - House - Final Passage - Con Res RC #230 (Y: 106 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #51 (Y: 104 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-02SenateFINALLY PASSED - Emergency 2/3 Present Required in concurrence
2021-07-02SenateOn Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
2021-06-14SenateOn motion by Senator BAILEY of York PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE - 2/3 Present Required, in concurrence.
2021-06-10HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2021-06-10HouseROLL CALL NO. 230 (Yeas 106 - Nays 31 - Absent 14 - Excused 0)
2021-06-10HouseFINALLY PASSED.
2021-06-10HouseThis being a Constitutional Amendment, in accordance with the provisions of Section 4 of Article X of the Constitution, a two-thirds vote of the membership of the House present was necessary.
2021-06-10HouseSpeaker laid before the House
2021-06-09HouseUnfinished Business
2021-06-08HouseUnfinished Business
2021-06-07HouseUnfinished Business
2021-06-03HouseUnfinished Business
2021-06-03HouseLater today assigned.
2021-06-03HouseOn motion of Representative DILLINGHAM of Oxford, TABLED pending FINAL PASSAGE.
2021-06-02SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-124) in concurrence
2021-06-02SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-124) READ and ADOPTED
2021-06-02SenateREAD ONCE
2021-06-02SenateOn motion by Senator DILL of Penobscot the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED.
2021-06-02SenateReports Read
2021-05-19HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2021-05-19HouseThe RESOLUTION was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-124).
2021-05-19HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the RESOLUTION was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2021-05-19HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-124) was READ and ADOPTED.
2021-05-19HouseThe RESOLUTION was READ ONCE.
2021-05-19HouseROLL CALL NO. 51 (Yeas 104 - Nays 41 - Absent 6 - Excused 0)
2021-05-19HouseOn motion of Representative O'NEIL of Saco, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2021-05-19HouseReports READ.
2021-05-04JointReported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP
2021-04-27JointVoted: Divided Report
2021-04-27JointWork Session Held
2021-04-20JointWork Session Reconsidered: TABLED
2021-04-15JointWork Session Held
2021-03-30HouseCarried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
2021-03-23JointWork Session Held: TABLED
2021-01-11HouseThe RESOLUTION was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401.
2021-01-11HouseReceived by the Clerk of the House on January 11, 2021.

Subjects


Maine State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=95&snum=130
Texthttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0061&item=1&snum=130
Texthttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0061&item=3&snum=130
Amendmenthttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0061&item=2&snum=130
Supplementhttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/bills_130th/fiscalpdfs/FN009501.pdf
Supplementhttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/bills_130th/fiscalpdfs/FN009502.pdf
Supplementhttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/bills_130th/fiscalpdfs/FN009503.pdf
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280078055&chamber=House&serialnumber=51
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280078055&chamber=House&serialnumber=230

Bill Comments

feedback