ME LD95 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Repeal the Restriction on Serving or Executing Civil Process on Sunday
Title
An Act To Repeal the Restriction on Serving or Executing Civil Process on Sunday
Sponsors
Sen. Cynthia Dill [D] | Sen. Mark Dion [D] | Sen. Stanley Gerzofsky [D] | Rep. Anne Graham [D] |
Rep. Charles Harlow [D] | Sen. Anne Haskell [D] | Rep. Terry Morrison [D] | Rep. John Tuttle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-12 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence | |
2011-04-07 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-04-07 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2011-04-06 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME And PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED in concurrence | |
2011-04-06 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Rosen, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2011-04-05 | (S) ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY | |
2011-04-05 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2011-04-05 | (S) Reports READ On motion by Senator HASTINGS of Oxford Majority Ought to Pass Report ACCEPTED, in concurrence. | |
2011-03-31 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-03-31 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED | |
2011-03-31 | (H) READ the Second Time. | |
2011-03-31 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative RICHARDSON of Carmel, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2011-03-30 | (H) TOMORROW ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING. | |
2011-03-30 | (H) The Bill was READ ONCE. | |
2011-03-30 | (H) On motion of Representative NASS of Acton, the Majority Ought to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. | |
2011-03-30 | (H) Reports READ. | |
2011-01-20 | (S) On motion by Senator Hastings of Oxford, REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY and ordered printed, in concurrence. | |
2011-01-18 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-01-18 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. | |
2011-01-18 | (H) Committee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed. |