ME LD946 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Protect the Privacy of Online Customer Information

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Protect the Privacy of Online Customer Information

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - Senate - Enactment RC #166 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - Reconsider RC #155 (Y: 50 N: 92 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2019-05-29 - House - Acc Report 'a' Otp RC #151 (Y: 96 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Table Until Later RC #129 (Y: 13 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-30SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2019-05-30HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-05-30HouseSubsequently, PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2019-05-30HouseROLL CALL NO. 155 (Yeas 50 - Nays 92 - Absent 6 - Excused 2)
2019-05-30HouseSubsequently, the motion to RECONSIDER FAILED.
2019-05-30HouseRepresentative STEWART of Presque Isle moved that the House RECONSIDER its action whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by House Amendment "B" (H-387).
2019-05-30SenateOn motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With Report A Ought to Pass READ and ACCEPTED AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY House Amendment "B" (H-387) in concurrence
2019-05-29HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-05-29HouseIn NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence.
2019-05-29HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by House Amendment "B" (H-387).
2019-05-29HouseOn motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham, House Amendment "B" (H-387) was READ and ADOPTED.
2019-05-29HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2019-05-29HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2019-05-29HouseROLL CALL NO. 151 (Yeas 96 - Nays 45 - Absent 7 - Excused 2 Vacant 1)
2019-05-29HouseSubsequently, REPORT A Ought to Pass was ACCEPTED.
2019-05-29HouseSpeaker laid before the House
2019-05-28HouseUnfinished Business
2019-05-28HouseLater today assigned.
2019-05-28HouseOn further motion of same Representative TABLED pending his motion to ACCEPT REPORT A Ought to Pass .
2019-05-28HouseRepresentative BERRY of Bowdoinham moved to ACCEPT REPORT A Ought to Pass .
2019-05-28HouseReports READ.
2019-05-23SenateSent down for concurrence
2019-05-23SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED
2019-05-23SenateREAD ONCE
2019-05-23SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 129 Yeas 13 - Nays 21 - Excused 1 - Absent 0
2019-05-23SenateMotion by Senator TIMBERLAKE of Androscoggin to Table Pending Acceptance of Report A Ought To Pass FAILED
2019-05-23SenateOn motion by Senator LAWRENCE of York Report A Ought to Pass ACCEPTED.
2019-05-23SenateReports Read
2019-02-21HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-02-21HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY.
2019-02-21SenateCommittee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback