ME LD936 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Establishing a Commission To Study the Existing and Potential Effects of Freshwater and Marine Debris on Maine's Freshwater and Coastal Habitats and Species
Title
Resolve, Establishing a Commission To Study the Existing and Potential Effects of Freshwater and Marine Debris on Maine's Freshwater and Coastal Habitats and Species
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2020-03-17 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2020-03-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2020-03-12 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-733). |
2020-03-12 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Resolve was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2020-03-12 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-733) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2020-03-12 | House | The Resolve was READ ONCE. |
2020-03-12 | House | On motion of Representative McCREIGHT of Harpswell, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2020-03-12 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-06-20 | House | Carried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on MARINE RESOURCES in concurrence |
2019-02-21 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-02-21 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on MARINE RESOURCES. |
2019-02-21 | House | Committee on Marine Resources suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=936&snum=129 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0691&item=1&snum=129 |