ME LD933 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Vetoed on May 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-01 - 20 Yeas - 15 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-01 - 20 Yeas - 15 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Establish a State Board of Dental Hygiene
Title
An Act To Establish a State Board of Dental Hygiene
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-01 - Senate - Veto Override (2/3) RC #661 (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-01 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #786 (Y: 138 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-04-17 - House - Enactment RC #721 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #786 (Y: 138 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-04-17 - House - Enactment RC #721 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-01 | Senate | 20 Yeas - 15 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Roll Call # 661 |
2014-05-01 | Senate | LD 933 In Senate, May 1, 2014, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 20 in the Affirmative and 15 in the Negative , accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill not become law and the VETO was SUSTAINED. |
2014-05-01 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-05-01 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 786V 138 having voted in the affirmative and 8 in the negative, with 5 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted. |
2014-05-01 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2014-05-01 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2014-05-01 | House | Later today assigned. |
2014-05-01 | House | On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham the Bill was TABLED pending RECONSIDERATION. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2014-04-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-04-17 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 721 (Yeas 143 - Nays 0 - Absent 8 - Excused 0) |
2014-04-17 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "B" (H-845), in concurrence. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment "B" (H-845) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2014-04-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-04-16 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "B" (H-845) |
2014-04-16 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2014-04-16 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2014-04-16 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2013-07-10 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1145. |
2013-07-09 | House | Carried over to any special and/or regular session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1145. |
2013-06-27 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-27 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to COMMITTING the Bill and accompanying papers to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator COMMITTED to the Committee on Appropriations and Financial Affairs, , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by Senator HILL of York. |
2013-06-17 | Senate | On motion by Senator CAIN of Penobscot, PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE, pending ENACTMENT, in concurrence. |
2013-06-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-17 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-452), in concurrence. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-452) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-06-13 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-13 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-452). |
2013-06-13 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2013-06-13 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-452) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2013-06-13 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2013-06-13 | House | Subsequently, The Committee Report was ACCEPTED. |
2013-06-13 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2013-06-12 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-06-12 | House | Later today assigned. |
2013-06-12 | House | On motion of Representative FREDETTE of Newport, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of the Committee Report. |
2013-06-12 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2013-06-11 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-06-11 | House | Later today assigned. |
2013-06-11 | House | On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of the Committee Report. |
2013-06-11 | House | The Committee Report was READ. |
2013-06-11 | House | On OBJECTION of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham REMOVED. |
2013-06-11 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2013-03-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator Patrick of Oxford, REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT, in concurrence. |
2013-03-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-03-07 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT. |
2013-03-07 | House | Committee on Labor, Commerce, Research and Economic Development suggested and ordered printed. |