ME LD921 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Eliminate Maine Clean Election Act Funding for Candidates in Gubernatorial Races
Title
An Act To Eliminate Maine Clean Election Act Funding for Candidates in Gubernatorial Races
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #104 (Y: 80 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2021-06-03 | Senate | On motion by Senator LUCHINI of Hancock the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Reports Read |
2021-06-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-02 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 104 (Yeas 80 - Nays 53 - Absent 18 - Excused 0) |
2021-06-02 | House | On motion of Representative CAIAZZO of Scarborough, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-02 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-05-27 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM |
2021-04-14 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-04-14 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS in concurrence |
2021-03-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-10 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. |
2021-03-10 | House | Committee on Veterans and Legal Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |