ME LD921 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-20 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-20 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Extend Time Limits for Placing Land in Trust Status under the Maine Indian Claims Settlement
Title
An Act To Extend Time Limits for Placing Land in Trust Status under the Maine Indian Claims Settlement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-20 - Senate - Veto Override (2/3) RC #403 (Y: 16 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-06-30 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #418 (Y: 131 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #418 (Y: 131 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-20 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2017-07-20 | Senate | LD 921 In Senate, July 20, 2017, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 16 IN FAVOR and 15 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill not become law and the VETO was SUSTAINED. |
2017-07-04 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-07-01 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-07-01 | Senate | On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending CONSIDERATION |
2017-06-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-30 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 418V 131 having voted in the affirmative and 15 in the negative, with 4 being absent, and 1 excused, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted. |
2017-06-30 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2017-06-19 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2017-06-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-16 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-513), in concurrence. |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-513) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2017-06-15 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2017-06-15 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-15 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-513). |
2017-06-15 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2017-06-15 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2017-03-07 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY in concurrence |
2017-03-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-03-07 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2017-03-07 | House | Committee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed. |