ME LD913 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-15 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-15 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Make Certain Civil Court Records Accessible by the Public Only at the Courthouse
Title
An Act To Make Certain Civil Court Records Accessible by the Public Only at the Courthouse
Sponsors
Rep. Tavis Hasenfus [D] | Sen. Joseph Baldacci [D] | Rep. Thomas Harnett [D] | Rep. Victoria Morales [D] |
Rep. Margaret O'Neil [D] | Rep. Lynne Williams [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-13 - House - Adopt Hah-996 To Cah-905 RC #562 (Y: 72 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #704 (Y: 16 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-04-05 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #517 (Y: 74 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #704 (Y: 16 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-04-05 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #517 (Y: 74 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-15 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2022-04-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-14 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-905) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-996) thereto Report ACCEPTED AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-905) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-996) thereto in concurrence |
2022-04-13 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-13 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2022-04-13 | House | Subsequently, the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-905) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-996) thereto |
2022-04-13 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-905) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-996) thereto was ADOPTED. |
2022-04-13 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 562 (Yeas 72 - Nays 54 - Absent 21 - Excused 0 - Vacant 4) |
2022-04-13 | House | On further motion of same Representative House Amendment "A" (H-996) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-905) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2022-04-13 | House | On motion of Representative HASENFUS of Readfield, the House RECEDED. |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Subsequently The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2022-04-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator DAUGHTRY of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE of The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Subsequently The Minority Ought Not To Pass was moved |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 704 Yeas 16 - Nays 16 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator CARNEY of Cumberland the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report FAILED |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Reports Read |
2022-04-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-05 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-905). |
2022-04-05 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2022-04-05 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-905) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2022-04-05 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2022-04-05 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 517 (Yeas 74 - Nays 61 - Absent 12 - Excused 0 - Vacant 4) |
2022-04-05 | House | On motion of Representative HARNETT of Gardiner, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2022-04-05 | House | Reports READ. |
2022-04-01 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2022-03-02 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2022-03-02 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2022-01-26 | Senate | On motion by Senator CURRY of Waldo The Majority REFERENCE to the Committee on JUDICIARY Report Accepted in concurrence |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Reports READ |
2022-01-26 | House | Sent for concurrence. |
2022-01-26 | House | Subsequently, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2022-01-26 | House | On motion of Representative PEBWORTH of Blue Hill, the Majority REFER to the Committee on JUDICIARY Report was ACCEPTED. |
2022-01-26 | House | Reports READ. |
2022-01-26 | Joint | Referred To: JUD |
2022-01-12 | Joint | Reported Out: REFERRED TO JUD/ONTP |
2022-01-06 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2022-01-06 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-07-19 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302. |
2021-06-03 | Joint | Carry Over Approved |
2021-05-21 | Joint | Carry Over Requested |
2021-05-20 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-05-13 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-04-28 | Senate | REFERENCED to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS in concurrence |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2021-04-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-04-28 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS |
2021-04-28 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2021-04-28 | House | Representative HARNETT from the Committee on JUDICIARY Reporting that the Bill be REFERRED to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS. |
2021-04-07 | Joint | Reported Out: REFERRED TO IDEA |
2021-04-07 | Joint | Referred To: IDEA |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-25 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-10 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY in concurrence |
2021-03-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-10 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2021-03-10 | House | Committee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed. |