ME LD913 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-23 - LD 913 In Senate, June 23, 2015, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 26 In Favor and 8 Against , accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-23 - LD 913 In Senate, June 23, 2015, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 26 In Favor and 8 Against , accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Expand Public Opportunities for Wildlife Management Education
Title
An Act To Expand Public Opportunities for Wildlife Management Education
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-23 - Senate - Veto Override (2/3) RC #345 (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #349 (Y: 116 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - House - Adopt Hah-384 To Cah-339 RC #210 (Y: 30 N: 115 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2015-06-22 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #349 (Y: 116 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - House - Adopt Hah-384 To Cah-339 RC #210 (Y: 30 N: 115 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-23 | Senate | LD 913 In Senate, June 23, 2015, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 26 In Favor and 8 Against , accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN. |
2015-06-22 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-22 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 349V 116 having voted in the affirmative and 28 in the negative, with 7 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted. |
2015-06-22 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2015-06-10 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2015-06-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-10 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2015-06-10 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-339). |
2015-06-10 | House | Subsequently, Committee Amendment "A" (H-339) was ADOPTED. |
2015-06-10 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 210 (Yeas 30 - Nays 115 - Absent 6 - Excused 0) |
2015-06-10 | House | On further motion of the same Representative, House Amendment "A" (H-384) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-339) was READ and FAILED ADOPTION. |
2015-06-10 | House | On further motion of the same Representative, the House RECONSIDERED ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (H-339). |
2015-06-10 | House | On motion of Representative CHAPMAN of Brooksville, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-339). |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-339), in concurrence. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-339) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2015-06-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-09 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-339) |
2015-06-09 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2015-06-09 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2015-06-09 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2015-03-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator Davis of Piscataquis, REFERRED to the Committee on Inland Fisheries and Wildlife, in concurrence. |
2015-03-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-03-12 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE. |
2015-03-12 | House | Committee on Inland Fisheries and Wildlife suggested and ordered printed. |