ME LD91 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 29 Yeas 32 - Nays 0 - Excused 3 - Absent 0
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Eliminate Gross Metering

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Eliminate Gross Metering

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-21 - Senate - Enactment RC #29 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - Acc Maj Ought To Pass Rep RC #3 (Y: 93 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 29 Yeas 32 - Nays 0 - Excused 3 - Absent 0
2019-03-21SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2019-03-19HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-03-19HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2019-03-14HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-03-14HouseThe House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-4).
2019-03-12SenateSent down for concurrence
2019-03-12SenatePASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-4) In NON-CONCURRENCE
2019-03-12SenateOn motion by Senator LAWRENCE of York Senate Amendment "A" (S-4) READ and ADOPTED
2019-03-12SenateCOMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED.
2019-03-07SenateASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
2019-03-07SenateREAD ONCE
2019-03-07SenateSubsequently The Majority Ought to Pass Report ACCEPTED in concurrence
2019-03-07SenateTaken from the table by the President
2019-03-05SenateUnfinished Business
2019-03-05SenateOn further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass Report,
2019-03-05SenateSenator LAWRENCE of York moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass Report.
2019-03-05SenateReports READ
2019-02-28HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-02-28HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.
2019-02-28HouseREAD the Second Time.
2019-02-28HouseCommittee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary. Report Accepted.
2019-02-26HouseTOMORROW ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING.
2019-02-26HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2019-02-26HouseROLL CALL NO. 3 (Yeas 93 - Nays 48 - Absent 7 - Excused 1) (Vacancy 2)
2019-02-26HouseOn motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham, the Majority Ought to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
2019-02-26HouseReports READ.
2019-01-15SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY in concurrence
2019-01-15HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-01-15HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY.
2019-01-15HouseCommittee on Energy, Utilities and Technology suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback