ME LD905 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on May 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-27 - TAKEN from the Table by Senator CAIN of Penobscot. FINALLY PASSED , in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on May 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-27 - TAKEN from the Table by Senator CAIN of Penobscot. FINALLY PASSED , in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Directing the Department of Education To Examine School Security
Title
Resolve, Directing the Department of Education To Examine School Security
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-31 - House - Final Passage - Emer RC #161 (Y: 133 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-27 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by Senator CAIN of Penobscot. FINALLY PASSED , in concurrence. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | On motion by Senator HILL of York, PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE, pending FINAL PASSAGE, in concurrence. |
2013-05-31 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-05-31 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 161 (Yeas 133 - Nays 1 - Absent 17 - Excused 0) |
2013-05-31 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House being necessary, a total was taken. |
2013-05-31 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-227), in concurrence. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-227) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-05-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-05-28 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-227) |
2013-05-28 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2013-05-28 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2013-05-28 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2013-03-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator Millett of Cumberland, REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS, in concurrence. |
2013-03-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-03-07 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. |
2013-03-07 | House | Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |