ME LD901 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on June 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-13 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on June 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-13 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend the Laws Governing the Determination of a Wind Energy Development's Effect on the Scenic Character of Maine's Special Places
Title
An Act To Amend the Laws Governing the Determination of a Wind Energy Development's Effect on the Scenic Character of Maine's Special Places
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Winsor [R] | Sen. Thomas Saviello [R] | Rep. Richard Campbell [R] | Rep. Robert Duchesne [D] |
Rep. Denise Harlow [D] | Rep. Nathan Wadsworth [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-13 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #298 (Y: 75 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-05-24 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #153 (Y: 93 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #153 (Y: 93 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-13 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2017-06-13 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-13 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 298V 75 having voted in the affirmative and 72 in the negative, with 3 being absent, and 1 excused, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill not become a law and the veto was sustained. |
2017-06-13 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2017-05-31 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2017-05-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-30 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-213) in concurrence |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-213) READ and ADOPTED |
2017-05-25 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-05-25 | Senate | On motion by Senator SAVIELLO of Franklin the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Reports Read |
2017-05-24 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-24 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-213). |
2017-05-24 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2017-05-24 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-213) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2017-05-24 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2017-05-24 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 153 (Yeas 93 - Nays 51 - Absent 5 - Excused 2) |
2017-05-24 | House | On motion of Representative TUCKER of Brunswick, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-05-24 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES in concurrence |
2017-03-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-03-07 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES. |
2017-03-07 | House | Committee on Environment and Natural Resources suggested and ordered printed. |