ME LD900 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on May 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on May 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding Insurance Coverage of Certain Dental Services
Title
An Act Regarding Insurance Coverage of Certain Dental Services
Sponsors
Sen. Andre Cushing [R] | Rep. Richard Malaby [R] | Rep. David Woodsome [R] | Rep. Maryanne Kinney [R] |
Rep. Richard Pickett [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-16 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2017-05-16 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-16 | House | On motion of Representative LAWRENCE of South Berwick, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-05-16 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-05-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator WHITTEMORE of Somerset The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-04 | Senate | On motion by Senator WHITTEMORE of Somerset Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Reports READ |
2017-03-07 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-03-07 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-03-07 | Senate | REFERENCE to the Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES suggested and ordered printed |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=900&snum=128 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0302&item=1&snum=128 |