ME LD9 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-25 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-25 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Establish Processing Time Limits for Permit by Rule Applications Under the Site Location of Development Laws
Title
An Act to Establish Processing Time Limits for Permit by Rule Applications Under the Site Location of Development Laws
Sponsors
Rep. James Boyle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-25 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2023-04-20 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-04-20 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-30), in concurrence. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2023-04-13 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-30) READ and ADOPTED |
2023-04-13 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2023-04-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-04-12 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-30). |
2023-04-12 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2023-04-12 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2023-04-11 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2023-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-02-08 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2023-02-08 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-01-04 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES in concurrence |
2023-01-04 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-01-04 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES. |
2023-01-04 | House | Committee on Environment and Natural Resources suggested and ordered printed. |