ME LD9 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Prohibit the Creation of a Firearms Owner Registry

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Prohibit the Creation of a Firearms Owner Registry

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-07 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #242 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #245 (Y: 122 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-09SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2017-06-08HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-06-08HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2017-06-07SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-87) in concurrence
2017-06-07SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-87) READ and ADOPTED
2017-06-07SenateREAD ONCE
2017-06-07SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 242 Yeas 35 - Nays 0 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
2017-06-07SenateOn motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence
2017-06-07SenateReports Read
2017-06-06HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-06-06HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-87).
2017-06-06HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2017-06-06HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-87) was READ and ADOPTED.
2017-06-06HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2017-06-06HouseROLL CALL NO. 245 (Yeas 122 - Nays 24 - Absent 4 - Excused 1)
2017-06-06HouseOn motion of Representative WARREN of Hallowell, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2017-06-06HouseSpeaker laid before the House
2017-06-05HouseUnfinished Business
2017-06-01HouseUnfinished Business
2017-05-31HouseUnfinished Business
2017-05-30HouseUnfinished Business
2017-05-25HouseUnfinished Business
2017-05-24HouseUnfinished Business
2017-05-23HouseUnfinished Business
2017-05-18HouseUnfinished Business
2017-05-17HouseUnfinished Business
2017-05-16HouseUnfinished Business
2017-05-11HouseUnfinished Business
2017-05-09HouseUnfinished Business
2017-05-04HouseUnfinished Business
2017-05-04HouseLater today assigned.
2017-05-04HouseOn motion of Representative GOLDEN of Lewiston, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report.
2017-05-04HouseReports READ.
2017-01-10SenateREFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY in concurrence
2017-01-05HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-01-05HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY.
2017-01-05HouseCommittee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback