ME LD899 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on May 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-06 - (S) Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on May 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-06 - (S) Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Summary
An Act To Require Candidates for Public Office To Provide Proof of Citizenship
Title
An Act To Require Candidates for Public Office To Provide Proof of Citizenship
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Cebra [R] | Sen. Andre Cushing [R] | Rep. Stacey Fitts [R] | Rep. Henry Joy [R] |
Rep. John Robinson [R] | Rep. Ralph Sarty [R] | Sen. Douglas Thomas [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-06 | (S) Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) | |
2009-05-06 | (S) On motion by Senator SULLIVAN of York Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED in concurrence | |
2009-05-06 | (S) Taken from the table by the President | |
2009-05-05 | (S) Unfinished Business | |
2009-04-30 | (S) Unfinished Business | |
2009-04-30 | (S) On further motion by Same Senator Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending her motion to ACCEPT Majority Ought Not To Pass Report in concurrence | |
2009-04-30 | (S) Senator SULLIVAN of York moved to Accept Majority Ought Not To Pass Report in concurrence | |
2009-04-30 | (S) Reports READ | |
2009-04-29 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-04-29 | (H) On motion of Representative TRINWARD of Waterville, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. | |
2009-04-29 | (H) Reports READ. | |
2009-03-05 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Senator Sullivan of York, REFERRED to the Committee on LEGAL AND VETERANS AFFAIRS and ordered printed, in concurrence. | |
2009-03-05 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-03-05 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LEGAL AND VETERANS AFFAIRS. | |
2009-03-05 | (H) Committee on Legal and Veterans Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |