ME LD89 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-31 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-31 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding Repeated Animal Trespass
Title
An Act Regarding Repeated Animal Trespass
Sponsors
Rep. Alexander du Houx [D] | Rep. Mark Eves [D] | Rep. Walter Kumiega [D] | Sen. Brian Langley [R] |
Rep. Jeffrey Mccabe [D] | Rep. Andrew O'Brien [D] | Rep. Meredith Strang Burgess [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-31 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required | |
2011-03-29 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-03-29 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2011-03-24 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY "A" (H-17) in concurrence | |
2011-03-24 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Rosen, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2011-03-23 | (S) ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. | |
2011-03-23 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence READ ONCE Committee Amendment "A" (H-17) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence | |
2011-03-22 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-03-22 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-17) | |
2011-03-22 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2011-03-22 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative RICHARDSON of Carmel, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2011-03-17 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2011-01-20 | (S) On motion by Senator Sherman of Aroostook, REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY and ordered printed, in concurrence. | |
2011-01-18 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-01-18 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY. | |
2011-01-18 | (H) Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry suggested and ordered printed. |