ME LD888 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Strengthen Protections against Civil Asset Forfeiture

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Strengthen Protections against Civil Asset Forfeiture

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-09 - Senate - Accept Maj Ontp Rpt RC #114 (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-11HousePlaced in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
2017-05-11HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-05-11HouseOn motion of Representative WARREN of Hallowell, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
2017-05-11HouseReports READ.
2017-05-09SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence
2017-05-09SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 114 Yeas 24 - Nays 10 - Excused 1 - Absent 0
2017-05-09SenateSubsequently The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED
2017-05-09SenateTaken from the table by the President
2017-05-04SenateUnfinished Business
2017-05-03SenateUnfinished Business
2017-05-03SenateOn further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending her motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report,
2017-05-03SenateSenator ROSEN of Hancock moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report.
2017-05-03SenateReports READ
2017-05-02SenateUnfinished Business
2017-05-02SenateOn motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought Not To Pass Report
2017-05-02SenateReports READ
2017-03-07HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-03-07HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY.
2017-03-07SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence
2017-03-07SenateREFERENCE to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY
2017-03-07SenateCommittee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY suggested and ordered printed

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback