ME LD882 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend the Laws Governing Confidentiality of Health Care Information To Enhance Public Safety
Title
An Act To Amend the Laws Governing Confidentiality of Health Care Information To Enhance Public Safety
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2013-06-13 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-13 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-06-12 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-12 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-264). |
2013-06-12 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2013-06-12 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2013-06-12 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-264) |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-264) READ and ADOPTED. |
2013-06-12 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2013-03-05 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-03-05 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | On motion by Senator Craven of Androscoggin REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed |