ME LD882 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-01 - (H) Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-01 - (H) Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Summary
An Act To Consolidate and Modernize Maine's Courts
Title
An Act To Consolidate and Modernize Maine's Courts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-01 | (H) Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) | |
2009-06-01 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-06-01 | (H) On motion of Representative PRIEST of Brunswick, the Bill and accompanying papers were INDEFINITELY POSTPONED. | |
2009-06-01 | (H) The Committee Report was READ. | |
2009-06-01 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2009-06-01 | (S) On motion by Senator BLISS of Cumberland Bill and accompanying papers INDEFINITELY POSTPONED (Remarks Made) | |
2009-06-01 | (S) Taken from the table by the President | |
2009-05-29 | (S) Unfinished Business | |
2009-05-29 | (S) On motion by Senator BARTLETT of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE of Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-154) Report Roll Call Ordered | |
2009-05-29 | (S) Taken from the table by the President | |
2009-05-28 | (S) Unfinished Business | |
2009-05-27 | (S) Unfinished Business | |
2009-05-26 | (S) Unfinished Business | |
2009-05-21 | (S) Unfinished Business | |
2009-05-20 | (S) Unfinished Business | |
2009-05-19 | (S) Unfinished Business | |
2009-05-18 | (S) Unfinished Business | |
2009-05-14 | (S) Unfinished Business | |
2009-05-14 | (S) Roll Call Ordered On motion by Senator MARRACHÉ of Kennebec Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE of OUGHT TO PASS AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-154) Report | |
2009-05-14 | (S) Taken from the table by the President | |
2009-05-13 | (S) Unfinished Business | |
2009-05-13 | (S) On motion by Senator BLISS of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE of Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-154) Report Roll Call Requested | |
2009-05-13 | (S) Report READ | |
2009-03-05 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-03-05 | (H) Bill REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. | |
2009-03-05 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2009-03-05 | (S) On motion by Senator Bliss of Cumberland REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY | |
2009-03-05 | (S) Committee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed. |