ME LD877 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on June 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-09 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on June 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-09 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Expand the Definition of Unlawful Sexual Touching
Title
An Act To Expand the Definition of Unlawful Sexual Touching
Sponsors
Sen. William Diamond [D] | Rep. Patrick Corey [R] | Sen. Susan Deschambault [D] | Rep. Jessica Fay [D] |
Rep. Lynne Williams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-09 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2021-06-09 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-09 | House | On motion of Representative DUNPHY of Old Town, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-09 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2021-06-08 | Senate | On motion by Senator DESCHAMBAULT of York Bill and accompanying papers INDEFINITELY POSTPONED |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2021-04-28 | Senate | On further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending her motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report, |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Senator DESCHAMBAULT of York moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-04-26 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP |
2021-04-12 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-04-12 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-10 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-10 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |