ME LD874 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on June 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-17 - ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on June 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-17 - ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
RESOLUTION, Proposing an Amendment to the Constitution of Maine To Require the Popular Election of Maine Constitutional Officers
Title
RESOLUTION, Proposing an Amendment to the Constitution of Maine To Require the Popular Election of Maine Constitutional Officers
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Baldacci [D] | Rep. John Andrews [R] | Sen. Richard Bennett [R] | Rep. William Faulkingham [R] |
Rep. William Tuell [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-15 - House - Passage To Be Engrossed RC #287 (Y: 62 N: 81 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2021-06-15 - House - Adopt Sbs-250 RC #286 (Y: 60 N: 82 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2021-06-15 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #285 (Y: 74 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - Senate - Adopt Sbs-250 RC #331 (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #330 (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - Adopt Sbs-250 RC #286 (Y: 60 N: 82 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2021-06-15 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #285 (Y: 74 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - Senate - Adopt Sbs-250 RC #331 (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #330 (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-17 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-17 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2021-06-17 | House | The House INSISTED on FAILING of PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-108) |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2021-06-16 | Senate | On motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc The Senate INSISTED To Accept The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report AND PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-108) AND Senate Amendment "B" (S-250) |
2021-06-15 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-15 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2021-06-15 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 287 (Yeas 62 - Nays 81 - Absent 8 - Excused 0) |
2021-06-15 | House | PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-108) FAILED. |
2021-06-15 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the RESOLUTION was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-06-15 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 286 (Yeas 60 - Nays 82 - Absent 9 - Excused 0) |
2021-06-15 | House | Senate Amendment "B" (S-250) was READ and FAILED ADOPTION. |
2021-06-15 | House | Subsequently, Committee Amendment "A" (S-108) was ADOPTED. |
2021-06-15 | House | Subsequently, Representative DILLINGHAM of Oxford WITHDREW her REQUEST for a Roll Call. |
2021-06-15 | House | Representative DILLINGHAM of Oxford REQUESTED a Roll Call. More than one-fifth of the members present expressed a desire for a roll call, which was ORDERED. |
2021-06-15 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-108) was READ. |
2021-06-15 | House | The RESOLUTION was READ ONCE. |
2021-06-15 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 285 (Yeas 74 - Nays 68 - Absent 9 - Excused 0) |
2021-06-15 | House | Subsequently, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-15 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2021-06-14 | House | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-14 | House | Later today assigned. |
2021-06-14 | House | On motion of Representative DUNPHY of Old Town, TABLED pending the motion of Representative MATLACK of St. George to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2021-06-14 | House | Representative MATLACK of St. George moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2021-06-14 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-108) and Senate Amendment "B" (S-250) |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 331 Yeas 20 - Nays 14 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 |
2021-06-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator BALDACCI of Penobscot Senate Amendment "B" (S-250) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-108) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-06-14 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 330 Yeas 27 - Nays 7 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Subsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-02 | Senate | On further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report, |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Senator BALDACCI of Penobscot moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-05-19 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2021-05-05 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-05-05 | Joint | Work Session Reconsidered |
2021-04-12 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-04-12 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-10 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-10 | House | The RESOLUTION was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |