ME LD871 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Require Disclosures Relating to the Sale of Residential Property Accessible by a Public Way and Any Means Other than a Public Way
Title
An Act To Require Disclosures Relating to the Sale of Residential Property Accessible by a Public Way and Any Means Other than a Public Way
Sponsors
Rep. Jessica Fay [D] | Sen. Shenna Bellows [D] | Rep. Benjamin Collings [D] | Rep. Roger Fuller [D] |
Rep. Anne-Marie Mastraccio [D] | Rep. Christina Riley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-09 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2017-06-08 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-08 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-414) READ and ADOPTED Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-414) in concurrence |
2017-06-06 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-06-06 | Senate | On motion by Senator KEIM of Oxford the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Reports Read |
2017-06-06 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-06 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-414). |
2017-06-06 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2017-06-06 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-414) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2017-06-06 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2017-06-06 | House | On motion of Representative MOONEN of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-06-06 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY in concurrence |
2017-03-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-03-07 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2017-03-07 | House | Committee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed. |